Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Gilbert De La Rosa vs. Fresno City College
A 23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Black, Donald presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
December 03, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
23 Unlimited - Other PI/PD/WD
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 17 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 3 months and 20 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
13 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST EACH DEFENDANT
27 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION:
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: Feb 03, 2020ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed
Date: Apr 23, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: Mar 12, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: Jan 15, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: Dec 12, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: Sep 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Dismissal Hearing |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Executed NOS Gilbert De La Rosa Notice Filed Notice of Settlement - Gilbert De La Rosa |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of calendar setting/hearing rescheduled |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Re: ADR ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed **CASE NOT AT ISSUE**Not signed by: Fresno City College Party(s) who signed: Shaun Bauman and Anthony DeMaria ADR method chosen: Thomas Simonian |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Deposit Notice Filed Notice of Jury Fee Deposit |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing CMC Re Noticed for 1/15/19 at 3:30pm in dept. 402 |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee Answer Filed |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
POS --- FRESNO CITY COLLEGE Proof of Service Fresno City College |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
POS --- STATE CENTER COMM COLLEGE Proof of Service State Center Community College District |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Civil Complaint filed |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil case cover sheet |