Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Michael Vue vs Esperanza Sanchez
A 22 Unlimited - Auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Black, Donald presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
22 Unlimited - Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
10 months and 16 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 6 months and 4 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: Jul 29, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: Jan 15, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: Jan 07, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: Sep 11, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Jury Req by both; 4-7 days Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Dismissal Hearing |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement filed Treated as an Unconditional Settlement |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation re ADR ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:Lee Jacobson |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Referral to ADR | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties Jury Req by both; 4-7 days |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee Answer Filed |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Deposit, payment,disbursment Jury Fees |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil case cover sheet |