Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
John Doe vs. A.J. Boggs & Company/COMPLEX // REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT
A 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Black, Donald presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Simpson, Alan;Category
42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (not specified)
Status
Removal
Case Duration
3 months and 28 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
(hereinafter referred to as the “‘Act”), Plaintiff JOHN DOE (“P1aintiff’), and all other persons
similarly situated, had a right t0 keep their personal medical information provided t0 Defendant A.J.
BOGGS & COMPANY (“A.J. Boggs” or “Defendant”) confidential. The short title of the Act
10 states, “The Legislature hereby finds and declares that persons receiving health care services have a
11 right t0 expect that the confidentiality of individual identifiable medical information derived by
12 health service providers be reasonably preserved. It isthe intention 0f the Legislature in enacting
13 this act, to provide for the confidentiality 0f individually identifiable medical information, While
14 permitting certain reasonable and limited uses 0f that information.” The Act specifically provides
15 that “a provider of health care, health care service plan, 0r contractor shall not disclose medical
16 information regarding a patient of the provider of health care or an enrollee or subscriber of a health
17 care service plan without first obtaining an authorization...” Civil Code. § 56.10(a). The Act
18 further provides that “Every provider of health care, health care service plan, pharmaceutical
19 company, or contractor who creates, maintains, preserves, stores, abandons, destroys, or disposes of
20 medical records shall do so in a manner that preserves the confidentiality of the information
21 contained therein. Any provider of health care, health care service plan, pharmaceutical company,
22 or contractor who negligently creates, maintains, preserves, stores, abandons, destroys, or disposes
23
24
25
1
A court may permit plaintiff to proceed under a fictitious name when exceptional circumstances
justify protecting his or her true identity, including matters of a highly sensitive and personal nature
(e.g., HIV—positive status). Doe v. Sup.Ct. (Luster) (2011) 194 Ca1.App.4th 750, 754, The Ninth
26
Circuit permits the use of pseudonyms in unusual cases where concealing a party’s identity is
necessary t0 protect that party from “harassment, injury, ridicule, or personal embarrassment.”
27
United States v. Doe, 655 F.2d 920, 922 n. 1 (9th Cir. 1981); Does I thru XXIII v. Advanced Textile,
28
214 F.3d 1058, 1086 (9‘11Cir. 2000). A pseudonym has been used in place of Plaintiff’s real name
due t0 privacy concerns as Plaintiff has a reasonable fear of severe stigma, harm, harassment,
injury, ridicule, and personal embarrassment in light 0f the nature of the case.
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR
DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
FOR VIOLATIONS OF:
(1) THE CONFIDENTIALITY 0F
MEDICAL INFORMATION ACT,
vvvvvvvvvvvvvvvv
CIVIL CODE §§ 56, ETSEQ.
1-100;
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
.1.
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Received for Signature
Date: Oct 09, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: Sep 11, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal of Action | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Stipulation and Order filed extending time for defendant to file a respond to Plaintiff's complaint Judge: Black, Donald |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Order Received for Signature order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to: 502 Order for: Extending time for A.J. Boggs & Company to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Black, Donald |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
9-24-18 - Proof of Service Proof of Service A.J. Boggs & Company |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
9-25-18 - Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Address Filed |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
9-11-18 - Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
9-11-18 - Civil Cover Sheet Civil case cover sheet |