Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Zenith Insurance Company vs. Oliverio Soriano Solano
A 23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd case was filed by Zenith Insurance Company, represented by Williams, Jeffrey J., against Solano, Oliverio Soriano, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Tharpe, D;Category
23 Unlimited - Other PI/PD/WD
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 0 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: Dec 12, 2019Conditional Settlement Reached
Date: Sep 27, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: Sep 19, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: Jul 31, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 23, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: Mar 05, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: Jan 07, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: Dec 20, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: Sep 11, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal-Final Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Full Dismissal |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Dismissal Hearing |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Conditional Settlement Reached Projected Completion Date: 12/1/19 |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default - eFiled 5.30.19 Request for Default Received |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from chamber |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CMC Statement CMC 5.28.19 Case Management Statement Filed |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of service of summons Proof of Service |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing CMC rescheduled from 5/28/19 to 6/3/19 at 3:30 pm in Dept. 402 |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
CMC Statement to file Case Management Statement Filed |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Notice Filed Jury fee deposit. |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action Ibarra Notice Filed of Action |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing CMC/CJAP Hearing |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Coversheet Civil case cover sheet |