Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jury Commissioner vs Emilio Allen
A 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case was filed by Jury Commissioner, against Allen, Emilio Josealmondo, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Gary D. Hoff presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 23, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
43 Unlimited - Other Petition (not specified)
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Juror Order to Show Cause filed
Date: Sep 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Contempt
Judge: Hoff, Gary |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Attempted Service of Juror OSC | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Juror Order to Show Cause filed | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Juror Affidavit filed |