Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kay Kim v. Anonymous MD 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, PAC-C 1, Eskenazi Medical Group, Lisa Harriset al
A Ct - Civil Tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Marion County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 18, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 22, 2024
Filing Location
Marion County, IN
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
CT - Civil Tort
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Order Granting Motion for Hearing
Date: Jun 18, 2024Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Appearance Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Memorandum/Brief Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Motion Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Motion for Hearing Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024TR56 Evidence Designation Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2024Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information
Date: Jun 18, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Motions | |
June 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Hearing ---- 6/18/2024 : Kay Kim Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 6/18/2024 : Kay Kim Notice Issued ---- 6/18/2024 : Kay Kim Video Hearing Information ---- 6/18/2024 : Kay Kim |
|
June 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Hearing ---- 6/18/2024 : John David Hoover Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 6/18/2024 : John David Hoover Notice Issued ---- 6/18/2024 : John David Hoover Video Hearing Information ---- 6/18/2024 : John David Hoover |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons (Eskenazi Medical Group) |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons (Anonymous MD #1, #2, #3, #4, #5 and Anonymous PA-C#1) |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Hearing Order Granting Motions to Set Hearing on All Motions |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons (Kay Kim) |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons (Lisa Harris) |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memorandum/Brief Filed Brief ISO Motion for Preliminary Determination of Law and Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Motion to Exclude from Public Access |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Hearing Filed Motion for Hearing |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
TR56 Evidence Designation Filed Designation of Evidence ISO MSJ |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information | |
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Video Hearing Information Your court date will begin by calling 1-844-992-4726 and entering the meeting number (2334 142 3693). You may also join by clicking the following link: https://mscourts.webex.com/meet/msc-cr-d01, or by going to WebEx.com and entering the meeting number: (2334 142 3693). |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Miscellaneous Motions scheduled for 08/15/2024 at 10:00 AM. |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Issued Please refer to the following instructions in order to log on for your Remote WebEx Hearing in Civil Court D01 on Thursday, August 15th, 2024. Your court date will begin by calling 1-844-992-4726 and entering the meeting number (2334 142 3693). You may also join by clicking the following link: https://mscourts.webex.com/meet/msc-cr-d01, or by going to WebEx.com and entering the meeting number: (2334 142 3693). |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |