Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
YES COMPANIES EXP FRED LLC DBA CANDLELIGHT VILLAGE v. GABRIELA CASTILLO, OSCAR VELASQUEZ
An Ev - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bartholomew County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2024
Last Refreshed
January 21, 2024
Filing Location
Bartholomew County, IN
Category
EV - Evictions (Small Claims Docket)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served sheriff service left with husband / copy mailed by court staff |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 1/17/2024 : YES COMPANIES EXP FRED LLC DBA CANDLELIGHT VILLAGE |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 1/17/2024 : GABRIELA CASTILLO;OSCAR VELASQUEZ |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Filed VERIFICATION OF OWNERSHIP YES HOMESALES |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed KIMBERLY HAYDEN FOR YES COMPANIES |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Eviction Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 10:30 AM. |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction sheriff service lease attached stamped envelope provided for sheriff service |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Compliance with Small Claims 8(C) Filed KIMBERLY HAYDEN FOR YES COMPANIES |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |