Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
R & C Fence Inc v. Kreager Group Inc
A Pl - Civil Plenary case was filed by R & C Fence Inc, represented by Mark H. Bains, against Kreager Group Inc, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 18, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 23, 2024
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
PL - Civil Plenary
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I: ACCOUNT STATED
COUNT II: BREACH OF CONTRACT
COUNT III: UNJUST ENRICHMENT
COUNT IV: CONVERSION
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Issued
Date: Apr 22, 2024Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Apr 18, 2024Appearance Filed
Date: Apr 18, 2024Certificate of Issuance of Summons
Date: Apr 18, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Hearing | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Order for Case Management Conference |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2024 at 2:30 PM. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons - R&C Fence v Kreager Group |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance - R&C Fence v Kreager Group |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint - R&C Fence v Kreager Group |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Issuance of Summons - R&C Fence v Kreager Group | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint for Damages |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Clerical Mistake Corrected Event dated 04/18/2024 Proposed Order Created in error. |