Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bonahoom & Bobilya, LLC v. Ismael Alves
Sc - Small Claims case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 12, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
SC - Small Claims
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Granting
Date: Oct 20, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 10/20/2023 : Daniel D. Bobilya;Michael E Licari |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Appear Telephonically |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Motion to Appear Telephonically |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Notice of Claim 7/24/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Bench Trial scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 9:00 AM. |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |