Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc v. Tiffanie N Marks
A Cc - Civil Collection case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 27, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
CC - Civil Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: Aug 04, 2023Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: Jul 28, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: Jul 28, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Jul 28, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Affidavit of Service |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed eFiling Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |