Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: the Marriage of Amy M Hackney and Marcus S Hackney
A Dc - Domestic Relations With Children case was filed by Hackney, Amy M, against Hackney, Marcus S, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 18, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 23, 2024
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
DC - Domestic Relations with Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion for Provisional Order | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order for Hearing ---- 4/18/2024 : Michael Alan Setlak Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 4/18/2024 : Michael Alan Setlak |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Issuance of Summons | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order for Hearing ---- 4/18/2024 : Amy M Hackney;Marcus S Hackney Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 4/18/2024 : Marcus S Hackney |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit in Re Motion for Provisional Orders |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage with Child(ren) Filed Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed E-Filing Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing on Motion for Provisional Order scheduled for 05/08/2024 at 10:00 AM. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Hearing Provisional Orders Hearing. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Provisional Orders Filed Motion for Provisional Orders |