Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
River Pointe TH, LP v. Chavaughn C Stapleton, Any and All Occupants
An Ev - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 18, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 23, 2024
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
EV - Evictions (Small Claims Docket)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served 4/19/2024. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction Notice of Claim |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Issuance of Summons Notice of Claim |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 05/13/2024 at 2:00 PM. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |