Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
River Pointe TH, LP v. Jonnae L Copprue
An Ev - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 19, 2023
Last Refreshed
December 24, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
EV - Evictions (Small Claims Docket)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 12/20/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction Notice of Claim (Eviction) |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 8:30 AM. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |