Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Three Rivers Federal Credit Union v. Aja Lanelle Russell
Sc - Small Claims case was filed by Three Rivers Federal Credit Union, represented by Brian Christopher Heck, against Russell, Aja Lanelle, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 01, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
SC - Small Claims
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Granting
Date: Nov 06, 2023Order Granting
Date: Sep 25, 2023Order Granting
Date: Sep 14, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 11/6/2023 : Brian Christopher Heck |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 11/6/2023 : Aja Lanelle Russell |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 9/25/2023 : Aja Lanelle Russell |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 9/25/2023 : Brian Christopher Heck |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Leave to Engage in Limited Discovery |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Motion for Leave to Engage in Limited Discovery |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 9/14/2023 : Brian Christopher Heck |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 9/14/2023 : Aja Lanelle Russell |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Trial Setting. Trial set for 01/17/2024 at 9:30 a.m. |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Motion for Trial Setting |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Bench Trial scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 9:30 AM. |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of New Claim |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |