Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Snow & Sauerteig LLP v. Luis Batista
Sc - Small Claims case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 12, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
SC - Small Claims
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 07/25/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Notice of Exclusion |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |