Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DBD Homes, LLC v. Dana J Nelson, Any and All Occupants, Sommer A Snow, Marcus D Mudd, Sr.
An Ev - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
July 22, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
EV - Evictions (Small Claims Docket)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served 7/18/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Issuance of Summons Notice of Claim |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Verification of Ownership |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction Notice of Claim |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 2:00 PM. |