Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Affiliated Family Dentists, LLC v. Aaron G. Alt
Sc - Small Claims case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
March 18, 2024
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
SC - Small Claims
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service - separately filed Certificate of Service on Affidavit for Judgment by Default |
|
October 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 10/20/2023 : Jacob Andrew Venderley;Matthew Alan Senko |
|
October 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 10/20/2023 : Aaron G. Alt |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Attorney fees Affidavit of Attorney's Fees |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Affidavit for Judgment by Default |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Issuance of Summons Notice of Claim |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Certified Mail - Green Card |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of New Claim |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed E-Filing Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |