Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Chase Manor Apts v. Precious Williams
An Ev - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) case was filed by Chase Manor Apts, represented by Pro Se, against Williams, Precious, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 12, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
EV - Evictions (Small Claims Docket)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Stipulated Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Issued
Date: Aug 09, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | First Class Mail Returned | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 10/3/2023 : Precious Williams |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 10/3/2023 : Chase Manor Apts |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment Filed | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Damages Hearing | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/10/2023 : Chase Manor Apts |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/10/2023 : Precious Williams |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed For Possession |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Partial Judgment entered | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Plaintiff declines to accept the Pre-Eviction Diversion Program. |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Damages Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 at 9:00 AM. |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Diversion Advisement Given | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Notice of Claim 7/18/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 11:00 AM. |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Self-represented |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Verification of Ownership |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance with Small Claims 8(C) Filed | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |