Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Edward Rose Development Co LLC v. Shauneille Fordham
A Cc - Civil Collection case was filed by Edward Rose Development Co Llc, Also Known As Dupont Lakes, represented by Scott Andrew Renner, against Fordham, Shauneille, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 09, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
CC - Civil Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Clerk Administrative Event
Date: Jul 27, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: Jul 26, 2023Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk Administrative Event Sheriff's mailed copy of Summons for Shauneille Fordham returned unserved. |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Summons For Shauneille D Fordham Returned Served By Allen County Sheriff. Leaving A Copy At The Residence |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint/Equivalent Pleading |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena/Summons Filed | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint |