Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Credit Management Inc v. Jose Fuentes
A Cc - Civil Collection case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 10, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
CC - Civil Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment
Date: Sep 21, 2023Motion for Default Judgment Filed
Date: Aug 28, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: Aug 28, 2023Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 9/21/2023 : Jose Fuentes |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 9/21/2023 : Jason E. Taylor;John Frederick Gillespie |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |