Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Snow & Sauerteig LLP v. Ruthanna Kile
Sc - Small Claims case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
March 18, 2024
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
SC - Small Claims
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Date: Aug 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Dismissed With Prejudice ---- 8/31/2023 : Tyler D Yeager;Paul Otto Sauerteig Order Granting Motion to Dismiss ---- 8/31/2023 : Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Dismiss ---- 8/31/2023 : Ruthanna Kile Dismissed With Prejudice ---- 8/31/2023 : Ruthanna Kile |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Cause dismissed with prejudice. |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed With Prejudice | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Filed Motion to Dismiss |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served 6/27/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Notice of Exclusion |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |