Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Affiliated Family Dentists LLC v. Imani Murphy
Sc - Small Claims case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
March 18, 2024
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
SC - Small Claims
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Stipulated Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service - separately filed Agreed Judgment |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 12/7/2023 : Imani Murphy |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 12/7/2023 : Jacob Andrew Venderley;Matthew Alan Senko |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed Agreed Judgment (Confession of Judgment) |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Issuance of Summons | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Efiling Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of New Claim |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |