Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BMC Property Group v. Courtney Kelly
Sc - Small Claims case was filed by Bmc Property Group, represented by Jacob Andrew Venderley, against Kelly, Courtney, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 12, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
SC - Small Claims
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Issuance of Summons | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Alias Notice of Claim |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Not Served Notice of New Claim returned unclaimed: No Mail Receptacle. |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Issuance of Summons Notice of Claim |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of New Claim |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed E-Filing Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |