Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance v. Amir Bakhit Mahmat Tegoure
A Pl - Civil Plenary case was filed by Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance, represented by Nicholas Richardson Dismukes, against Tegoure, Amir Bakhit Mahmat, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 18, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
PL - Civil Plenary
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Granting
Date: Sep 28, 2023Motion to Vacate Hearing Filed
Date: Sep 27, 2023Order Granting
Date: Sep 27, 2023Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed
Date: Sep 27, 2023Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information
Date: Sep 27, 2023Answer Filed
Date: Jul 26, 2023Notice Issued to Parties
Date: Jul 26, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: Jul 26, 2023Order Issued
Date: Jul 19, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: Jul 18, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Hearing | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 9/28/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Final Judgment entered | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 9/27/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 9/27/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 9/27/2023 : Amir Bakhit Mahmat Tegoure |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Hearing Filed Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate 12/4/23 Case Management Conferecne |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Vacate Case Management Conference |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Plaintiff's Notice of Exclusion |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 10:15 AM was cancelled. Reason: Other. |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Notice Issued to Parties ---- 7/26/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer Filed | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Issued to Parties | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Summons For Amir Bakhit Mahmat Tegoure Returned Served By Allen County Sheriff. Leaving A Copy At The Residence |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 7/19/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 7/19/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 7/19/2023 : Amir Bakhit Mahmat Tegoure |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Order Setting Case Management Conference |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 10:15 AM. |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons- Amir Bakhit Mahmat Tegoure |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint for Damages |