Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: The Petition For Expungement and Sealing of Records of Lance Edwards
A Xp - Expungement case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 13, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 18, 2024
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
XP - Expungement
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a petition for expungement of conviction records filed by Lance K. Edwards through his counsel Thomas Essex. The petition requests the court to expunge misdemeanor records under various case numbers and statutes. Lance K. Edward…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Notice Issued to Parties
Date: Jun 13, 2024Appearance Filed
Date: Jun 13, 2024Petition to Expunge/Seal Records per IC 35-38-9
Date: Jun 13, 2024Response Ordered
Date: Jun 13, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Notice Issued to Parties ---- 6/13/2024 : David Henry McClamrock;Thomas D. Essex;Michael James McAlexander |
|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Issued to Parties REQUEST FOR RECOMMENDATION |
|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition to Expunge/Seal Records per IC 35-38-9 Petition for Expungement of Conviction Records |
|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response Ordered REQUEST FOR RECOMMENDATION |
|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint |