Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: the Marriage of Kayleigh Ann Fromm and Marqual Dontae Holley
A Dc - Domestic Relations With Children case was filed by Fromm, Kayleigh Ann, against Holley, Marqual Dontae, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 19, 2023
Last Refreshed
December 24, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
DC - Domestic Relations with Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 12/20/2023 : Marqual Dontae Holley |
|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 12/20/2023 : Grant Thomas Stupeck |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance for Grant T. Stupeck |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Party Fact Sheet |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued L.R 719 (1); L.R 719 (2) Order entered. |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage with Child(ren) Filed Verified Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |