Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
John Tze et al vs City of Palo Alto et al
On April 24, 2017 a writ of mandate unlimited (02) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. Judge Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 24, 2017
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2023
Filing Location
Santa Clara County, CA
Filing Court House
Santa Clara
Category
Writ of Mandate Unlimited (02)
Status
Appealed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Appeal: Notice of Completion
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: Feb 11, 2019Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: Jan 23, 2019Stipulation
Date: Dec 20, 2018Order
Date: Dec 20, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: Dec 20, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: Dec 17, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: Dec 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: Dec 04, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Nov 27, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Nov 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: Oct 30, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: Oct 30, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 25, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: Sep 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: Sep 21, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: Sep 20, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 24, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: Jun 29, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: Jun 29, 2018Hearing: Other
Date: Jun 29, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: Jun 07, 2018Order
Date: Jun 04, 2018Brief
Date: Mar 16, 2018Brief: Trial
Date: Feb 28, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: Jan 25, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: Jan 08, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: Dec 15, 2017Minute Order
Date: Oct 17, 2017Court Trial: Long Cause
Date: Oct 12, 2017Brief: Reply
Date: Oct 04, 2017Brief: Trial
Date: Oct 04, 2017Brief: Trial
Date: Sep 26, 2017Brief: Trial
Date: Aug 30, 2017Stipulation
Date: Aug 21, 2017Minute Order
Date: Jun 27, 2017Minute Order
Date: Jun 06, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Receipt for Record from David Lanferman (H046597) |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Receipt for Record from Rick Jarvis (H046597) |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Receipt for Record from DCA (H046597) |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Notice of Completion H046597 |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Receipt for Record H046597 |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Notice to Court Reporter H046597 |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance Cross-Appellant (H046597) |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Designation Cross-Appellant's H046597 |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Cross-Appellant's Default Notice (H046597) |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal Cross Appeal (H046597) |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver from Reporter Kelly Shainline for 10/17/17 & 6/29/18 |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Designation Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal - Corrected |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal Cross-Appeal |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Designation Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Exparte stipulation for entry of judgment, by atty Roy. |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Re: entry of judgment, granted by Judge Kirwan |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Judgment and Notice of Order for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Entry of Judgment |
|
December 04, 2018 | hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 19 |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Edgewood Case Management Statement |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 30, 2018 | hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 19 |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference |
|
September 21, 2018 | hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 19 |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Hrg: 6-29-18, Petitioner is not entitled to mandamus relief under CCP sec 1085 because it failed to exhaut administrative remedies as to Citation Nos. 1-56 and 71-72, signed by Judge Kirwan. |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference and Case Management Statement | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore |
|
June 29, 2018 | hearing |
Hearing: Other
Judge: Department 19 |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Order |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order (Judge Kirwan). With POS. |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Change Address/Firm Name | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Brief City of Palo Alto's Supplemental Trial Brief in Opposition to Petition and Complaint |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Brief: Trial Petitioners' Supplemental Trial Brief |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Modifying the Court ORder of 12/15/2017, re the Schedule for Submission of Supplemental Briefs and re-Submission of the Petition for Writ of Traditional Mandate. Rsp's supplemental brief will be served and submitted for filing with the Court on or before 03/16/2018 *see order for more details* (Judge Kirwan) |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Decision on Petn for Writ of Administrative Mandate and Order for Further Briefing on Traditional Mandate. The petition for writ of traditional mandate will be deemed resubmitted on 01/26/2018. No further oral argument will be permitted unless the Court later determines, after reviewing the supplemental briefs, that such oral argument would be useful. *See order for more details* (Judge Kirwan) POS by mail cc to David Lanferman and Rick William Jarvis |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore | |
October 12, 2017 | hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 19 |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request: Action Petitioners filed 170.6 challenge against trial judge, Carrie Zepeda. GRANTED signed by Theodore Zayner. |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Brief: Reply | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief: Trial in Opposition to Petn/Complt & Response Brief on Admin Appeal (reformatted) |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Of lodging of administrative record. |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief: Trial in Opposition to Petn and Complt and Response Brief on Administrative Appeal |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief: Trial Opening Brief |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support of David Lanferman |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support of John Tze |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Staying Administrative Proceedings Pending Trial and Judgment |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Change of firm name, by atty Roy. |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Re: Amended the Schedule for Record Preparation, Request for Hearing, and Trial Setting, granted by Judge Arand. |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Mtn to Reconsider its Mtn for Prelim Injunc is GRANTED. So Ordered. Stoelker |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 27, 2017 | hearing |
Motion: Reconsider
Judge: Department 13 |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion: Preliminary Injunction with memo of p's and a's and declaration of David P. Lanferman and Alyssa M. Bussey; Atty Lanferman. 06/27/2017, 9AM, D13 Judge: James L. Stoelker |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte for OST on mtn for prelim injunction is GRANTED. Mtn for reconsideration set for 6/27/17 9am D13. (David P. Lanferman & Rick W. Jarvis) Signed by Judge Stoelker *see for further details Judge: James L. Stoelker |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS Denying Mtn for preliminary injunction per judge Stoelker |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 06, 2017 | hearing |
Hearing: OSC TRO/Preliminary Injunction
Judge: Department 13 |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter From D.9 regarding Stipulation and Order that was already signed on 5/18/17 Judge: Mary E. Arand |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief: Reply in sup of req for prelim injunction (Alyssa M. Bussey) hrg 6/5/17 8:45am D-9 Judge: Mary E. Arand |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Without Prej Plt. John Tze and Def. Lance Bayer (Atty Alyssa Bussey) |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) atty: Rick Jarvis |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Memo of p's & a's in oppos....document was filed on 05/24/17 |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Memo of p's & a's in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction, 6/5/17 8:45AM Dept. 9, by atty Howzell, Palo Alto City Attorney. Judge: Mary E. Arand |
|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support in supt of supplemenatl mtn and opening brief in suppt |
|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief Supplemental mtn and opening brief in suppt of issuing a preliminary injunction |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte GRANTED by JUDGE ARAND for hrg & briefing schedule on plt's app for issuance of prelim injunction (Alyssay M. Bussey & Rick W. Jarvis); Preliminary Injunction 06/05/2017 |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Re: Supplemental motion & opening brief in support of preliminary injunction - The court cannot file support documents to a motion that is not on file. |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections to ex parte app for TRO & prelim injunction (Rick W. Jarvis) |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request: Judicial Notice in sup of ex parte app for TRO & prelim injunction (David P. Lanferman) |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application - Notice Required for TRO & prelim injunction (David P. Lanferman) |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for prepartion of record of proceedings | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Related Cases related to case #17cv309031 |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |