Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ammaria Allen vs Eric Allen
A Dissolution - Minor Children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Meehan, Kathleen A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 07, 2017
Last Refreshed
April 07, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Category
Dissolution - Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached HRG: 10/29/2019 Judicial Officer: D Kalemkarian Dept: 202 Clerk: M.Betancourt Bailiff: D.Cervantes-Johnson Reporter: Not Reported Petitioner: Not present Respondent: Not present You are hereby ordered to appear in Department 202 on 05/12/2020 at 11:00 a.m., to show cause why the above-referenced case should not be dismissed. California law requires that Family Law matters proceed in an effective and timely manner from initial filing to final disposition. (Fam. Code 2450, subd. (a), and Standards of Judicial Administration, standard 5.30.) In deciding whether a case is progressing in an effective and timely manner, the Court considers procedural milestones, including the following: (A) A proof of service of Summons and petition should be filed within 60 days of case initiation; (B) If no response has been filed, and the parties have not agreed on an extension of time to respond, a request to enter default should be submitted within 60 days after the date the response was due; (C) The petitioner's preliminary declaration of disclosure should be served within 60 days of the filing of the petition; (D) When a default has been entered, a judgment should be submitted within 60 days of the entry of default; (E) Whether a trial date has been requested or scheduled; and (F) When the parties have notified the court that they are actively negotiating or mediating their case, a written agreement for judgment is submitted within six months of the date the petition was filed, or a request for trial date is submitted. (Cal. Rule of Court, rule 5.83(c) (4).) The Court has reason to believe that the above-referenced case is not progressing in an effective and timely manner. |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Return Letter Judgment Return Letter mailed to Petitioner in envelope provided. |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX: Granted default with judgment and file |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. HRG: 10/2/2018 Judicial Officer: D. Tharpe Dept: 202 Clerk: Mp Vang Bailiff: J Espinoza Petitioner not present Respondent not present No appearance, clerk to re-notice status conference Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 10/29/2019 Time: 10:30a.m. Dept: 202 |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Simplified Financial Statement | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration Petitioner's |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Granted as to Eric Shannon Allen |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Petitioner's Preliminary |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Sent default w/judgment to default desk |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Served Eric Allen on 02/15/17. |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution with Children with Summons |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |