Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DORIS NOYE OBINKURAH -vs- LEROY OWENS,carolyn moses
A Motor Vehicle - Jury case was filed by Noye Obinkurah, Doris, against Moses, Carolyn, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Calendar, A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 12, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 16, 2024
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Judge
Hon. Calendar, A
Category
Motor Vehicle - Jury
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I OWENS NEGLIGENCE
COUNT II MOSES RESPONDEAT SUPERIOR
COUNT III OWENS WILLFULL WANTON
COUNT IV NEGLEGENT ENTRUSTMENT MOSES
COUNT V WILLFUL WANTON ENTRUSTMENT MOSES FILED DATE: 6/12/2024 5:43 PM 2024L006511
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves a case where Plaintiff Doris Noye Obinkurah is suing Defendants Leroy Owens and Carolyn Moses. In Count I, Doris alleges negligence on Owens' part for striking her with his vehicle while she was in a crosswalk, resulting i…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: Jun 12, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2024 |
Time Case Management (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Flores, Barbara Nubia) Resource: Location L2206 Court Room 2206 |
|
|
June 12, 2024 |
Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed (Jury Demand) Party: Plaintiff NOYE OBINKURAH, DORIS |
||
June 12, 2024 |
Issued And Returnable Party: Plaintiff NOYE OBINKURAH, DORIS |
|
|
June 12, 2024 |
Filed Party: Plaintiff NOYE OBINKURAH, DORIS |
|
|
June 12, 2024 | Case Filing |
|