Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ross McAuley-vs-Clyde Langham
A Motor Vehicle - Non Jury case was filed by Mcauley, Ross, against Langham, Clyde, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Kathy M. Flanagan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 12, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 16, 2024
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Motor Vehicle - Non Jury
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves a legal case between Ross McAuley and Clyde Langham. Ross McAuley, represented by Keating Law Offices, P.C., is the plaintiff, while Clyde Langham is the defendant. The incident occurred on October 15, 2023, in Chicago, Il…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: Jun 12, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2024 |
Time Case Management (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Flanagan, Kathy M) Resource: Location L2210 Court Room 2210 |
|
|
June 12, 2024 |
Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed Party: Plaintiff McAuley, Ross |
||
June 12, 2024 |
Issued And Returnable Party: Plaintiff McAuley, Ross |
|
|
June 12, 2024 | Case Filing |
|