Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
henderson, harold vs Henderson, Haniyyah
On April 19, 2022 a petition for dissolution of marriage - children case was filed by Henderson, Harold, against Henderson, Haniyyah, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Erika Orr presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 19, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2022
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: ORR, ERIKA |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Leave To File -Report Of Proceedings Within 28 Days - Allowed -
Judge: ORR, ERIKA |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities Judgment Pet/Resp - Allowed
Judge: ORR, ERIKA |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Completion Of Minor Children Parenting Education/ Respondent - Filed - |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation To Hear Uncontested Cause In District 6 |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Filed |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Dissolution Filed |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | New Case Filing |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibits Filed |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Children |
|