Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MASON PAMELA vs WILLIAMS DERRICK
On April 29, 2021 a petition for administrative declaration of parentage - dhfs case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 09, 2023
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
Petition for Administrative Declaration of Parentage - DHFS
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed - |
|
|
April 16, 2022 |
Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold Attorney Code: 36486 Attorney Name: DEPT C/ S ENFORCEMENT |
|
|
April 09, 2022 |
Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold Attorney Code: 36486 Attorney Name: DEPT C/ S ENFORCEMENT |
|
|
March 29, 2022 | E-Filing Exemption - Filed |
|
|
March 29, 2022 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 29, 2022 | Motion Filed |
|
|
January 03, 2022 | Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed - |
|
|
January 03, 2022 | Case Set On Progress Call |
|
|
January 03, 2022 | Issue Of Insurance - Reserved - |
|
|
January 03, 2022 | Order For Child Support - Allowed - |
|
|
December 03, 2021 | Motion Filed |
|
|
November 10, 2021 | Answer To Complaint Filed |
|
|
November 10, 2021 | E-Filing Exemption - Filed |
|
|
November 10, 2021 | Appearance And Voluntary Acknowledgement Filed |
|
|
September 29, 2021 | Alias Summons - Retd P.S. |
|
|
September 29, 2021 | Alias Summons - Issued - Paid |
|
|
June 10, 2021 |
Summons - Retd N.S. Defendant: WILLIAMS DERRICK J Date Of Service: 05/24/2021 |
|
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD N.S. |
|
May 06, 2021 | Summons Issued And Returnable |
|
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
April 29, 2021 |
Pet For Admin Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs Defendant: WILLIAMS DERRICK |
|
|
April 29, 2021 | New Case Filing |
|
|
April 29, 2021 | Voluntary Acknowledgment Of Paternity - Filed |
|
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PET FOR ADMIN DECLARATION OF PARENTAGE - DHFS |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PATERNITY - FILED - |
|