Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Vincevicius, Marius vs Sandaval, Alessa Jessica
On July 21, 2021 a petition for dissolution case was filed by Vincevicius, Marius, represented by Reifman Arkady A, against Sandaval, Alessa Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Elizabeth Loredo-Rivera presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 21, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2022
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Judge
Hon. Elizabeth Loredo-Rivera
Category
Petition for Dissolution
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit As To Military Service Filed |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: RIVERA, ELIZABETH L. |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Dissolution Filed |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Filed |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate & Motion For Default Filed |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Filed |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Publication Filed |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Mailing Filed |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | New Case Filing |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit For Service By Publication Filed |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit As To Military Service Filed |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition For Dissolution Of |
|