Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STAMPS MARSHA vs ALLTOWN BUS SERVICE et al
On April 29, 2021 a motor vehicle - non jury case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 07, 2023
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
Motor Vehicle - Non Jury
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Order Case Transferred For Trial To Municipal Dept, 1st Dist |
|
|
June 27, 2022 | Strike Or Vacate An Order - Allowed - |
|
|
June 27, 2022 | Transfer Case To Presiding Judge Within District/Division |
|
|
June 27, 2022 | Reinstate Case - Allowed - |
|
|
June 22, 2022 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
June 22, 2022 |
Motion Filed Motion to Vacate DWP |
|
|
June 08, 2022 | Dismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
|
|
March 28, 2022 | Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt - |
|
|
March 28, 2022 | Exchange Information - Allowed - |
|
|
March 28, 2022 | Extend Time - Allowed - |
|
|
March 10, 2022 | Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt - |
|
|
March 09, 2022 | Exchange Information - Allowed - |
|
|
March 01, 2022 |
Notice Of Motion Filed NOM MTD Gary Truman pursuant to SCR 103b |
|
|
March 01, 2022 |
Motion To Dismiss Filed Defendants MTD Gary Truman pursuant to SCR 103b |
|
|
January 25, 2022 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand) Appearance and JD_Marc Pawlus Stamps |
|
|
January 05, 2022 | Proof Of Service Filed |
|
|
December 21, 2021 | Alias Summons Issued |
|
|
December 17, 2021 | Issue Alias Summons - Allowed - |
|
|
December 17, 2021 | Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed - |
|
|
December 16, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
December 16, 2021 | Routine Motion Filed |
|
|
December 13, 2021 |
Motion Filed Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 103b |
|
|
December 13, 2021 |
Notice Of Motion Filed NOM Stamps |
|
|
May 18, 2021 | Summons Served - Corporation/Company/Business |
|
|
May 17, 2021 |
Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Not Listed Litigant: TRUMAN |
|
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NOT LISTED |
|
April 29, 2021 | Affidavit Filed |
|
|
April 29, 2021 | New Case Filing |
|
|
April 29, 2021 | Summons Issued And Returnable |
|
|
April 29, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
April 29, 2021 |
Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed Litigant: ALLTOWN BUS SERVICE Filing Fee: $388.00 |
|
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|