Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY vs LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE et al
On April 29, 2021 a declaratory judgment case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Celia G. Gamrath presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
November 13, 2023
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
Declaratory Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Strike Or Vacate An Order - Denied - |
|
|
June 22, 2023 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
June 22, 2023 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
May 25, 2023 | Agreed Order Entered |
|
|
May 25, 2023 | Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed |
|
|
May 25, 2023 | Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement |
|
|
May 16, 2023 |
Exhibits Filed Exhibit A to Motion to Reconsider |
|
|
May 16, 2023 |
Motion Filed Motion to Reconsider |
|
|
May 16, 2023 |
Notice Of Motion Filed Notice of Motion |
|
|
April 17, 2023 | Summary Judgment - Denied - |
|
|
April 17, 2023 | Motion To - Denied - |
|
|
April 17, 2023 | Summary Judgment - Allowed - |
|
|
April 17, 2023 | Judgment For Plaintiff |
|
|
April 17, 2023 | Order Final And Appealable |
|
|
February 21, 2023 | Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement |
|
|
February 21, 2023 | Agreed Order Entered |
|
|
February 21, 2023 | Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed |
|
|
February 21, 2023 |
Strike From The Call - Allowed - 2-22-23 @9a.m. |
|
|
February 16, 2023 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
February 16, 2023 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
February 02, 2023 |
Brief Filed Washington and Perkins Response to Motion for Summary Juegment |
|
|
January 09, 2023 | Strike From The Call - Allowed - |
|
|
January 09, 2023 | File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - |
|
|
January 09, 2023 | Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - |
|
|
January 09, 2023 | Case Set On Progress Call |
|
|
January 09, 2023 | Motion To - Denied - |
|
|
January 09, 2023 | Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed |
|
|
January 09, 2023 | Motion To - Allowed - |
|
|
January 03, 2023 |
Notice Of Motion Filed Notice of Motion |
|
|
January 03, 2023 |
Motion Filed Motion to Compel Discovery, Rule on Objections and Extend Briefing Schedule |
|
|
December 20, 2022 |
Certificate Of Service Filed certificate of service of answer to request for production |
|
|
December 20, 2022 | Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed - |
|
|
December 20, 2022 | Strike From The Call - Allowed - |
|
|
December 20, 2022 | Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed - |
|
|
December 14, 2022 |
Notice Of Motion Filed notice of motion for substitution of attorneys |
|
|
December 14, 2022 |
Motion Filed motion for substitution of attorneys |
|
|
December 13, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed notice of filing objection to deposition |
|
|
December 13, 2022 |
Objections Filed objection to interrogatories |
|
|
December 13, 2022 |
Objections Filed objection to depositions |
|
|
December 13, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed notice of filing objection to interrogatories |
|
|
December 12, 2022 | Substitution Of Attorney Filed |
|
|
December 12, 2022 |
Motion Filed motion for substitution of attorneys |
|
|
November 29, 2022 | Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed |
|
|
November 29, 2022 | Case Set On Progress Call |
|
|
November 29, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
November 29, 2022 | File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed |
|
|
November 23, 2022 |
Notice Of Deposition Filed Deposition Notice of Mirjana Condos |
|
|
November 23, 2022 |
Notice Of Deposition Filed Deposition Notice of Angie Kedzior |
|
|
November 23, 2022 |
Interrogatories Filed Interrogatories Propounded to Safeway |
|
|
November 23, 2022 |
Notice Of Deposition Filed Rule 206 Notice of Deposition |
|
|
November 23, 2022 |
Notice Of Deposition Filed Deposition Notice of Diane Donnelly |
|
|
November 23, 2022 |
Interrogatories Filed Rule 214 Request to Produce to Safeway |
|
|
November 16, 2022 | File Affidavits - Allowed - |
|
|
November 16, 2022 | Taking Of Deposition - Denied - |
|
|
November 16, 2022 | Produce Exhibits OrOtherRecordsOrDocumentsOrPerson-Allowed |
|
|
November 16, 2022 | File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed |
|
|
November 16, 2022 | Discovery - Allowed - |
|
|
November 16, 2022 | Amend - Allowed - |
|
|
November 16, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
November 16, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
November 02, 2022 |
Answer/Response/Reply Reply to Safeway's Objection |
|
|
November 02, 2022 |
Notice Filed Notice of Filing |
|
|
October 26, 2022 | Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement |
|
|
October 26, 2022 | Extend Time - Allowed - |
|
|
October 26, 2022 | File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed |
|
|
October 26, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed notice of filing objection |
|
|
October 26, 2022 |
Objections Filed objection to motion to extend briefing schedule and discovery |
|
|
October 26, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
October 26, 2022 | Motion To - Continued - |
|
|
October 19, 2022 |
Motion Filed Defendant Muriya Washington's Combined Motion |
|
|
October 19, 2022 |
Notice Of Motion Filed Notice of Motion |
|
|
October 19, 2022 |
Admissions Filed Defendant Muriya Washington 191b Affidavit |
|
|
October 17, 2022 |
Answer/Response/Reply Defendant LM's Reply Brief In Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
|
October 17, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed Notice of Filing - Defendant LM's Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
|
September 20, 2022 |
Motion Filed cross motion for summary judgment |
|
|
September 20, 2022 |
Notice Of Motion Filed notice of cross motion for summary judgment |
|
|
September 19, 2022 | File Additional Party Complaint - Allowed - |
|
|
September 19, 2022 | File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - |
|
|
September 19, 2022 | File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed |
|
|
September 19, 2022 | Case Set On Progress Call |
|
|
September 19, 2022 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
September 19, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
September 19, 2022 | Extend Time - Allowed - |
|
|
September 19, 2022 |
Answer/Response/Reply response to LM motion for summary judgment |
|
|
September 19, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed notice of filing response to LM motion for summary judgment |
|
|
September 19, 2022 | Default - Denied - |
|
|
August 26, 2022 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - Appearance for Muriya Washington |
|
|
August 22, 2022 | Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - |
|
|
August 22, 2022 | Case Continued For Case Management Conference-Allowed |
|
|
August 22, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
August 22, 2022 |
Certificate Of Service Filed certificate of service of order of 8-22-22 |
|
|
August 22, 2022 | CH5338 |
|
|
August 22, 2022 | Case Set On Progress Call |
|
|
August 22, 2022 | Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed |
|
|
August 17, 2022 |
Exhibits Filed Exhibit B - Liberty Policy |
|
|
August 17, 2022 |
Notice Of Motion Filed Notice of Motion - Defendant LM's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
|
August 17, 2022 |
Motion Filed Defendant LM's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
|
August 17, 2022 |
Exhibits Filed Exhibit A - Police Report |
|
|
August 17, 2022 |
Exhibits Filed Group Ex. C - Ans to Rogs, Resp to RFP and Resp to RTA |
|
|
August 12, 2022 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
August 12, 2022 | Motion Filed |
|
|
July 12, 2022 |
Certificate Of Service Filed certificate of service of 7-11-22 order |
|
|
July 11, 2022 | Case Set On Progress Call |
|
|
July 11, 2022 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
July 11, 2022 | File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - |
|
|
July 11, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
June 27, 2022 |
Answer/Response/Reply Response Brief in Opposition to Safeway's Motion to Compel by LM Insurance |
|
|
June 27, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Of Response Or Answer Filed Notice of Filing - Response Brief in Opposition to Safeway's Motion to Compel by LM Insurance |
|
|
June 22, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed notice of filing re-notice of Dorsey Foster deposition |
|
|
June 22, 2022 |
Notice Of Discovery Deposition Filed re-notice of Dorsey Foster deposition |
|
|
June 07, 2022 | Electronic Notice Sent |
|
|
June 06, 2022 | Case Set On Progress Call |
|
|
June 06, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
June 06, 2022 | Default - Allowed - |
|
|
June 06, 2022 | File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed |
|
|
June 06, 2022 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
June 06, 2022 |
Certificate Of Service Filed certificate of service of 6-6-22 order |
|
|
May 16, 2022 |
Motion Filed motion to compel discovery answers |
|
|
May 16, 2022 |
Certificate Of Service Filed certificate of service of 5-16-22 order |
|
|
May 16, 2022 |
Notice Of Motion Filed notice of motion for default |
|
|
May 16, 2022 |
Notice Of Deposition Filed notice of subpoena deposition of Dorsey Foster |
|
|
May 16, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed notice of filing deposition notice |
|
|
May 16, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
May 16, 2022 |
Notice Of Motion Filed notice of motion to compel discovery answers |
|
|
May 16, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
May 16, 2022 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
May 16, 2022 |
Motion Filed motion for default |
|
|
April 14, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
April 14, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
March 17, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
March 17, 2022 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
March 17, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
March 17, 2022 |
Certificate Of Service Filed certificate of service of 3-17-22 order |
|
|
February 17, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
February 17, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
February 17, 2022 |
Certificate Of Service Filed certificate of service of 2-17-22 order |
|
|
February 17, 2022 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
January 24, 2022 |
Answer To Additional Defense Filed answer to affirmative defenses |
|
|
January 24, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed notice of filing answer to affirmative defenses |
|
|
January 24, 2022 |
Certificate Of Service Filed certificate of service of interrogatory answers, notice to produce, Rule 213(f) interrogatories |
|
|
January 21, 2022 |
Answer To Amended Complaint Filed Defendant LM's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and for Stay of Arbitration |
|
|
January 21, 2022 |
Notice Of Filing Filed NOF and COS - LM's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and for Stay of Arbitration |
|
|
December 08, 2021 |
Certificate Of Service Filed order of 12-2-21 served |
|
|
December 02, 2021 | File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - |
|
|
December 02, 2021 | Case Set On Status Call |
|
|
December 02, 2021 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
December 02, 2021 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
December 02, 2021 | File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed |
|
|
November 18, 2021 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
November 18, 2021 | Amended Complaint Filed |
|
|
October 21, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: SAFEWAY INSURA CE COMPANY Court Room: 2508 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
October 21, 2021 |
Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed - Plaintiff: SAFEWAY INSURA CE COMPANY Court Room: 2508 |
|
|
October 21, 2021 |
File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - Court Room: 2508 |
|
|
October 21, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: SAFEWAY INSURA CE COMPANY Court Room: 2508 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
October 20, 2021 | Answer To Declaratory Judgment Filed |
|
|
October 20, 2021 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
August 27, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: SAFEWAY INSURA CE COMPANY Court Room: 2508 Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
August 27, 2021 |
Case Set On Progress Call Plaintiff: SAFEWAY INSURA CE COMPANY Court Room: 2508 Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
August 17, 2021 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
August 17, 2021 | Request For Admission Of Facts Filed |
|
|
August 16, 2021 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - Filing Fee: $251.00 |
|
|
August 16, 2021 | Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - |
|
|
July 21, 2021 |
Electronic Notice Sent Court Room: 2508 Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
July 13, 2021 | Affidavit Of Special Process Server |
|
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER |
|
June 23, 2021 | Affidavit Of Special Process Server |
|
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER |
|
June 21, 2021 |
Alias Summons Issued And Returnable Filing Fee: $6.00 |
|
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
June 14, 2021 |
Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed - Plaintiff: SAFEWAY INSURA CE COMPANY Court Room: 2508 |
|
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Judge: GAMRATH, CELIA, G. |
|
June 11, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
June 11, 2021 | Motion To Appoint Special Process Server |
|
|
June 11, 2021 | Summons - Retd P.S. |
|
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD P.S. |
|
May 21, 2021 | Summons - Retd N.S. |
|
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD N.S. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Summons Issued And Returnable |
|
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
April 29, 2021 | New Case Filing |
|
|
April 29, 2021 |
Declaratory Judgment Complaint Filed Litigant: PERKINS ASTARIA Filing Fee: $388.00 |
|
|
April 29, 2021 |
Case Set On Case Management Call Court Room: 2508 Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT FILED |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Judge: GAMRATH, CELIA, G. |
|