Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GAINES DEBORAH vs SANDERS CARLTON
On April 26, 2021 an injunction case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Michael T. Mullen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 26, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | Voluntary Dismissal, Non-Suit Or Dismissed By Agreement |
|
|
September 29, 2022 | Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter |
|
|
September 29, 2022 | Agreed Order Entered |
|
|
July 28, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
July 28, 2022 | Case Set On Status Call |
|
|
July 28, 2022 | Comply - Allowed - |
|
|
July 07, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
July 07, 2022 | Agreed Order Entered |
|
|
July 07, 2022 | Case Set On Status Call |
|
|
June 06, 2022 | Case Set On Status Call |
|
|
June 06, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
June 06, 2022 | Agreed Order Entered |
|
|
April 18, 2022 | Case Set On Status Call |
|
|
April 18, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
March 28, 2022 | Case Set On Status Call |
|
|
March 28, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
March 24, 2022 | Strike From The Call - Allowed - |
|
|
March 24, 2022 | Order To Stand - Allowed |
|
|
March 22, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
March 22, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
February 15, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
February 15, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
November 03, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed Court Room: 2510 |
|
|
November 03, 2021 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Room: 2510 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
September 29, 2021 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Room: 2510 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
September 29, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed Court Room: 2510 |
|
|
August 25, 2021 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Room: 2510 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
August 25, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed Court Room: 2510 |
|
|
August 23, 2021 | Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - |
|
|
July 16, 2021 |
Electronic Notice Sent Plaintiff: SANDERS CARLTON Court Room: 2510 Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
July 16, 2021 |
Case Mgmt Call Notice Mailed Court Room: 2510 Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
July 16, 2021 |
Electronic Notice Sent Attorney Code: 99500 Attorney Name: PRO SE Court Room: 2510 Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
June 21, 2021 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - Filing Fee: $251.00 |
|
|
June 21, 2021 | Answer Filed |
|
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
May 21, 2021 | Summons - Retd P.S. |
|
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD P.S. |
|
April 26, 2021 | New Case Filing |
|
|
April 26, 2021 |
Injunction Complaint Filed Attorney Code: 99500 Attorney Name: PRO SE Litigant: SANDERS CARLTON Filing Fee: $388.00 |
|
|
April 26, 2021 |
298 Petition Filed - Plaintiff/Petitioner Attorney Code: 99500 Attorney Name: PRO SE |
|
|
April 26, 2021 |
Summons Issued And Returnable Attorney Code: 99500 Attorney Name: PRO SE |
|
|
April 26, 2021 |
Case Set On Case Management Call Attorney Code: 99500 Attorney Name: PRO SE Court Room: 2510 Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | 298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | INJUNCTION COMPLAINT FILED |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Judge: MULLEN, MICHAEL TULLY |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|