Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TANINAH KRISTEN vs TANINAH MOHAMMED
On January 03, 2019 a petition for dissolution of marriage case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 03, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER REFERRAL FOR OTHER EVALUTION BY PRIVATE RESOURCE - ALLOWED
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED DATE |
|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO MOTION FILED |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY MOTION FILED |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED DATE |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER PARENTING TIME TO PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
CAUSE CONTINUED FOR HEARING (PET) - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUPERVISED PARENTING TIME - ALLOWED
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR POSSESSION OF CHILD - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUPERVISED PARENTING TIME - ALLOWED
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
APPOINT ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED -
Judge: KUBALANZA, JOAN M. |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY MOTION FILED |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE FILED |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED DATE |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY MOTION FILED |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID - |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY MOTION FILED |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED -
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF PROTECTION:RESPONDENT SERVED IN OPEN COURT - ALLOWED -
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY MOTION FILED |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD P.S. |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
OP - PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF CHILDREN TO PETITIONER
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
OP - EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION OF RESIDENCE TO PETITIONER
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - CONTINUED
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
ALLOCATION OF PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES JUDGMENT PET/RESP - ALLOWED
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | 298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | 298 PETITION HEARING - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
298 PETITION PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Judge: POWERS, PATRICK J. |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY MOTION FILED |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF |
|