Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TCF INVENTORY FINANCE, IN vs SMITH JEFFREY
On January 29, 2019 a contract case was filed by Tcf Inventory Finance, In, represented by Thompson Coburn Llp, against Smith Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
CONTRACT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/LEAVE TO REFILE-ALLOWED
Judge: SNYDER JAMES E |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Judge: SNYDER JAMES E |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS OUTSIDE ILLINOIS FILED |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Judge: SNYDER JAMES E |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Judge: SNYDER JAMES E |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS CITATION - ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Judge: SNYDER JAMES E |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: SNYDER JAMES E |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|