Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALDERSON CYNTHIA vs ANAGNOS NICHOLAS
On January 25, 2019 a breach of contract - non-jury case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Thomas R. Mulroy presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2019
Last Refreshed
November 13, 2023
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
Breach of Contract - Non-Jury
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 |
Court Date To Stand - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSON C |
|
|
March 04, 2021 |
Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw Counter-Claim - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
March 04, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Telephonic Proceedings - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSON C |
|
|
March 04, 2021 | Voluntary Dismissal W/Leave To Refile-Allowed |
|
|
March 04, 2021 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
March 04, 2021 |
Discovery - Denied - Litigant: ALDERSON C |
|
|
March 04, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
March 04, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 04, 2021 | Routine Motion Filed |
|
|
March 03, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
March 03, 2021 | Emergency Motion Filed |
|
|
March 02, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 01, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 01, 2021 | Emergency Motion Filed |
|
|
March 01, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
February 26, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Court Time: 1045 |
|
|
February 26, 2021 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
February 26, 2021 |
Case Set On Trial Call Court Time: 1045 |
|
|
February 23, 2021 |
Case Set On Status Call - Continued - Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0910 |
|
|
February 23, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0910 |
|
|
December 29, 2020 | Motion Filed |
|
|
December 29, 2020 | Amended Notice Filed |
|
|
December 18, 2020 |
Electronic Notice Sent Litigant: ANAGNOS NICHOLAS |
|
|
December 18, 2020 | Postcard Generated |
|
|
December 16, 2020 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
December 16, 2020 |
Prove Up Set For - Continued - Litigant: ALDERSON C Court Time: 1130 |
|
|
December 16, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSON C Court Time: 1130 |
|
|
December 16, 2020 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
December 16, 2020 | Motion Filed |
|
|
December 16, 2020 | Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw Counter-Claim - Allowed - |
|
|
December 16, 2020 | Default - Allowed - |
|
|
December 15, 2020 | Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - |
|
|
November 23, 2020 | Proof Of Service Filed |
|
|
November 18, 2020 | Close Discovery - Allowed - |
|
|
November 18, 2020 | Execute Or Perform - Allowed - |
|
|
November 18, 2020 | File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - |
|
|
November 18, 2020 |
Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed - Court Time: 0920 |
|
|
November 18, 2020 |
Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed - Attorney Code: 29953 Attorney Name: FEROLIE STEPHENSON |
|
|
November 13, 2020 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
November 12, 2020 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
November 12, 2020 |
Document Submitted via eFiling 1 document(s) submitted via eFile on this date. Document(s) attached to this event might be duplicate(s) to docs attached to other events on this case. |
|
|
November 10, 2020 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
November 10, 2020 | Motion Filed |
|
|
November 04, 2020 |
Court Date To Stand - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSON C |
|
|
November 04, 2020 |
Extend Time - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON C |
|
|
November 04, 2020 |
Discovery - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON C |
|
|
November 04, 2020 |
Discovery - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS N |
|
|
October 27, 2020 | Motion Filed |
|
|
October 27, 2020 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
October 09, 2020 |
Case Set On Trial Call Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
October 09, 2020 |
Discovery - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
October 09, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
October 09, 2020 |
Execute Or Perform - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
October 09, 2020 |
Execute Or Perform - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
October 09, 2020 |
Discovery - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
September 15, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Court Time: 0915 |
|
|
September 15, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0915 |
|
|
September 14, 2020 |
Notice Of Rejection Of Award Filing Fee: $750.00 |
|
|
September 14, 2020 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
September 03, 2020 | Produce Exhibits, Other Records, Documents, Person -Denied- |
|
|
August 31, 2020 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
August 31, 2020 | Emergency Motion Filed |
|
|
July 28, 2020 | Response / Reply - Filed |
|
|
July 28, 2020 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
July 24, 2020 |
File Affirmative Defense - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS N |
|
|
July 24, 2020 |
File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS N |
|
|
July 22, 2020 |
LAW DIVISION MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DATE IS STRICKEN Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
July 22, 2020 | Motion Filed |
|
|
July 22, 2020 |
Exchange Information - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
July 22, 2020 |
JDGMNT/REJ OF LAW DIV MAND ARB AWARD STATUS DATE IS STRICKEN Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
July 22, 2020 |
LAW DIVISION MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DT IS RESCHEDULED Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
July 22, 2020 | Amended Notice Filed |
|
|
July 22, 2020 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
July 22, 2020 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
July 08, 2020 | Motion Filed |
|
|
July 08, 2020 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
June 29, 2020 |
LAW DIVISION MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DATE IS STRICKEN Litigant: ALDERSEN Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
June 29, 2020 |
LAW DIVISION MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DT IS RESCHEDULED Litigant: ALDERSEN Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
June 29, 2020 |
Court Date To Stand - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSEN Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMMERCIAL MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DATE IS RESCHEDULED FOR
Judge: MULROY THOMAS R JR. |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMMERCIAL MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DATE IS STRICKEN
Judge: MULROY THOMAS R JR. |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
COURT DATE TO STAND - ALLOWED
Judge: MULROY THOMAS R JR. |
|
May 07, 2020 |
Court Date To Stand - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSEN Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
May 07, 2020 |
LAW DIVISION MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DATE IS STRICKEN Litigant: ALDERSEN Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
May 07, 2020 |
LAW DIVISION MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DT IS RESCHEDULED Litigant: ALDERSEN Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
COURT DATE TO STAND - ALLOWED
Judge: MULROY THOMAS R JR. |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMMERCIAL MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DATE IS STRICKEN
Judge: MULROY THOMAS R JR. |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMMERCIAL MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING DATE IS RESCHEDULED FOR
Judge: MULROY THOMAS R JR. |
|
January 31, 2020 |
CASE SET FOR LAW DIVISION MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING Litigant: ALDERSEN CYNTHIA Court Time: 0900 |
|
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE SET FOR COMMERCIAL MANDATORY ARBITRATION HEARING
Judge: FLANNERY, JAMES P |
|
January 27, 2020 |
CASE SET FOR STATUS ON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/REJECTION OF AWARD Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
January 27, 2020 |
CASE REFERRED TO LAW DIVISION MANDATORY ARBITRATION Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE SET FOR STATUS ON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/REJECTION OF COMM. MAND ARB AWARD
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE REFERRED TO COMMERCIAL MANDATORY ARBITRATION
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
January 13, 2020 |
Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
November 13, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call - Continued - Litigant: ANAGNOS Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
November 13, 2019 |
File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
November 13, 2019 |
Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Alw- Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
November 13, 2019 |
Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd - Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
November 13, 2019 |
File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - DND -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
October 28, 2019 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
October 28, 2019 | Response / Reply - Filed |
|
|
October 28, 2019 | Notice Filed |
|
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED |
|
October 15, 2019 | Answer To Counterclaim Filed |
|
|
October 15, 2019 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
October 15, 2019 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
October 15, 2019 | Answer To Motion Filed |
|
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO MOTION FILED |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED |
|
September 26, 2019 |
Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
September 16, 2019 |
File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
September 16, 2019 |
Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt - Litigant: ANAGNOS Court Time: 1015 |
|
|
September 16, 2019 |
File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
September 16, 2019 |
File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
September 16, 2019 |
Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
September 16, 2019 |
Strike From The Call - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
September 09, 2019 |
Counter Claim Filed - Fee Paid - Filing Fee: $137.00 |
|
|
September 09, 2019 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - Filing Fee: $251.00 |
|
|
September 09, 2019 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
September 09, 2019 | Motion Filed |
|
|
September 09, 2019 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
September 09, 2019 |
Motion Scheduled Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | COUNTER CLAIM FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
August 12, 2019 |
File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS |
|
|
August 12, 2019 |
Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed - Litigant: ANAGNOS Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
June 27, 2019 |
Alias Summons Issued Filing Fee: $6.00 |
|
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED |
|
June 26, 2019 |
Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed - Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
June 26, 2019 |
Service By Special Order Of Court - Allowed Litigant: ALDERSON |
|
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE BY SPECIAL ORDER OF COURT - ALLOWED
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
June 03, 2019 |
Alias Summons Issued Filing Fee: $6.00 |
|
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED |
|
May 15, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call - Continued - Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
March 21, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call - Continued - Litigant: ALDERSON Court Time: 0945 |
|
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
March 13, 2019 |
Alias Summons Issued Filing Fee: $6.00 |
|
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED |
|
March 11, 2019 | Issue Alias Summons - Allowed - |
|
|
March 11, 2019 | Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed - |
|
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
March 05, 2019 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 05, 2019 | Routine Motion Filed |
|
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ROUTINE MOTION FILED |
|
February 14, 2019 | Postcard Generated |
|
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
January 25, 2019 |
Contract Complaint Filed Litigant: ANAGNOS NICHOLAS Filing Fee: $368.00 |
|
|
January 25, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
January 25, 2019 | New Case Filing |
|
|
January 25, 2019 | Summons Issued And Returnable |
|
|
January 25, 2019 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
January 25, 2019 | Case Set On Individual Calendar |
|
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: SHERLOCK PATRICK J |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED |
|