Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PAOLELLO JAMES vs ADVENTIST LAGRANGE MEMORI et al
On January 08, 2019 a medical mal-practice case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
MEDICAL MAL-PRACTICE
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Malpractice
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTCARD GENERATED |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTCARD GENERATED |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTCARD GENERATED |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Judge: LAWLER, CHRISTOPHER EDWARD |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: LAWLER, CHRISTOPHER EDWARD |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: LAWLER, CHRISTOPHER EDWARD |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
TERMINATE AS RESPONDENT IN DISCOVERY - ALLOWED
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S. |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S. |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW AFFIDAVITS - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AFFIDAVITS - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND) |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE FILED |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FILED |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FOR DISCOVERY - RETD SERVED |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MEDICAL MAL-PRACTICE COMPLAINT FILED |
|