Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOSEPH MICHELLINE vs FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATI et al
On January 04, 2019 a personal injury(motor vehicle) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 04, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
PERSONAL INJURY(MOTOR VEHICLE)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTCARD GENERATED |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTCARD GENERATED |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTCARD GENERATED |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Judge: MARAS, MARCIA |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FILED |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'MALLEY, KAREN L. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FILED |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Judge: O'HARA, JAMES N. |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND) |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: OTHER REASON |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED |
|