Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PANICI CATALDO vs VITTORI, IRA DAVID
A case was filed by Panici Cataldo, represented by Wintrust Internal Counsel, against Vittori, Ira David, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ARBITRATION AWARDS - FILED |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|