Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WATERS MICHEAL vs CAPSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP
On January 25, 2019 a class action case was filed by Waters Micheal, represented by Werman Salas Pc, against Capstone Restaurant Group, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
CLASS ACTION
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS OUTSIDE ILLINOIS FILED |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS OUTSIDE ILLINOIS FILED |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND) |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE FILED |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|