Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPAN vs MALTBIA COREY
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWER FILED |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - ALLOWED -
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - ALLOWED -
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Judge: MITCHELL, RAYMOND W. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: MITCHELL, RAYMOND W. |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ***APPT. SELLING OFFICER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE FILED |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR MAILING FILED |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Judge: LYLE, FREDDRENNA M. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE FILED |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|