Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ACUITY vs CHURCH STREET STATION TOW et al
On January 08, 2019 a declaratory judgment case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Franklin U. Valderrama presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2019
Last Refreshed
November 13, 2023
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
Declaratory Judgment
Status
Appealed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 |
Notice Of Change Of Office Filed Notice of Change of Address |
|
|
February 03, 2022 | Placita And Cert Of Transcript Of Record For Appeal Filed |
|
|
December 17, 2021 | REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL |
|
|
December 03, 2021 | Notice Of Appeal Filed |
|
|
November 05, 2021 | Notice Filed |
|
|
November 05, 2021 |
Strike Or Vacate An Order - Denied - Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
November 05, 2021 |
Memorandum Of Opinion Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
October 21, 2021 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
October 07, 2021 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
October 07, 2021 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
September 09, 2021 |
Execute Or Perform - Allowed - Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
September 09, 2021 |
Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
August 27, 2021 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
August 27, 2021 | Reconsider(Set For Motion Hearing) |
|
|
August 27, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
July 30, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Allowed - Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
July 30, 2021 |
Memorandum Of Opinion Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
July 30, 2021 |
Memorandum Of Opinion Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
July 30, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Denied - Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
July 30, 2021 |
Judgment For Plaintiff Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
July 21, 2021 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
July 07, 2021 |
File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
July 07, 2021 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
July 07, 2021 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
July 07, 2021 |
File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
July 07, 2021 | Brief Filed |
|
|
July 07, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
July 07, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
June 23, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
June 23, 2021 | Motion Filed |
|
|
June 23, 2021 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
June 23, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
May 26, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Continued - Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 1100 |
|
|
May 26, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
March 18, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Continued - Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 0200 |
|
|
March 18, 2021 |
Motion To - Denied - Litigant: CHURCH STREET ASSOCIATION Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
March 11, 2021 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
March 11, 2021 | Motion Filed |
|
|
March 11, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 11, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
February 24, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
February 24, 2021 |
Motion To - Allowed - Litigant: CHURCH STREET ASSOCIATION Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
February 24, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Continued - Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 0200 |
|
|
February 19, 2021 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
February 19, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
February 19, 2021 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
February 08, 2021 |
Motion To - Continued - Litigant: CHURCH STREET STATION Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
February 08, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Litigant: CHURCH STREET STATION Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
January 29, 2021 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
January 29, 2021 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
January 29, 2021 | Motion Filed |
|
|
January 29, 2021 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
January 22, 2021 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
January 22, 2021 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
January 05, 2021 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
January 05, 2021 | Answer To Counterclaim Filed |
|
|
December 16, 2020 | Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing) |
|
|
December 16, 2020 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
December 14, 2020 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
December 14, 2020 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
December 14, 2020 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
December 14, 2020 | Motion Filed |
|
|
December 01, 2020 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
December 01, 2020 |
Counter Claim Filed - Fee Paid - Filing Fee: $137.00 |
|
|
December 01, 2020 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
November 16, 2020 |
Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
November 16, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
November 16, 2020 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
November 16, 2020 |
Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
November 16, 2020 |
File Counter-Claim Or Cross Complaint - Allowed - Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
October 01, 2020 |
Agreed Order Entered Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
October 01, 2020 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
October 01, 2020 |
Agreed Order Entered Litigant: M/I HOMES OF C ICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 |
|
|
September 30, 2020 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
September 30, 2020 | Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing) |
|
|
August 10, 2020 | Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed |
|
|
August 10, 2020 |
Continuance - Allowed - Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
June 02, 2020 | Electronic Notice Sent |
|
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
April 21, 2020 |
Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
March 26, 2020 | Answer To Counterclaim Filed |
|
|
March 26, 2020 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
February 26, 2020 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
February 26, 2020 | File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - |
|
|
February 26, 2020 | Amend - Allowed - |
|
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMEND - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
February 19, 2020 |
Answer And Counter Filed Filing Fee: $137.00 |
|
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND COUNTER FILED |
|
February 18, 2020 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
February 18, 2020 | Answer To Amended Complaint Filed |
|
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
January 07, 2020 | Strike From The Call - Allowed - |
|
|
January 07, 2020 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
January 07, 2020 | File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - |
|
|
January 07, 2020 | Extend Time - Allowed - |
|
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
December 19, 2019 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
December 19, 2019 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
December 19, 2019 | Motion Filed |
|
|
December 19, 2019 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
November 20, 2019 | Amended Complaint Filed |
|
|
November 20, 2019 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
November 20, 2019 | File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - |
|
|
November 20, 2019 | Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed - |
|
|
November 20, 2019 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
November 20, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
October 31, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
October 03, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
July 10, 2019 | Extend Time - Allowed - |
|
|
July 10, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Time: 1000 |
|
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
May 08, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
May 08, 2019 |
Extend Time - Continued - Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXTEND TIME - CONTINUED -
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
April 01, 2019 |
Electronic Notice Sent Plaintiff: M/I HOMES OF CHICAGO, LLC Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
April 01, 2019 |
Electronic Notice Sent Plaintiff: CHURCH STREET STATION TOW Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
April 01, 2019 |
Electronic Notice Sent Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
March 29, 2019 | Affidavit Of Service Filed |
|
|
March 29, 2019 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED |
|
March 27, 2019 | Extend Time For Filing(Set For Motion Hearing) |
|
|
March 27, 2019 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
March 27, 2019 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 27, 2019 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - Filing Fee: $237.00 |
|
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ***EXTEND TIME FOR FILING(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
March 12, 2019 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - Filing Fee: $237.00 |
|
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
March 08, 2019 | Affidavit Filed |
|
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
February 27, 2019 | Summons - Retd P.S. |
|
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD P.S. |
|
February 19, 2019 | Summons Issued And Returnable |
|
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 08, 2019 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
January 08, 2019 |
Declaratory Judgment Complaint Filed Litigant: M/I HOMES OF CHICAGO, LLC Filing Fee: $368.00 |
|
|
January 08, 2019 | New Case Filing |
|
|
January 08, 2019 |
Case Set On Case Management Call Court Room: 2402 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT FILED |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Judge: VALDERRAMA FRANKLIN ULYSES |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|