Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
THE PITTS FAMILY TRUST AG vs FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I et al
On January 03, 2019 an owner occupied single-family home/condo case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Marian E. Perkins presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 03, 2019
Last Refreshed
November 11, 2023
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
Owner Occupied Single-Family Home/Condo
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
General Family
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2022 | Dismiss Entire Cause - Plaintiff - |
|
|
August 09, 2022 | Case Set On Status Call |
|
|
August 08, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
August 03, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
August 03, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
July 13, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
July 13, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
June 17, 2022 | Strike From The Call - Allowed - |
|
|
June 17, 2022 | Case Set On Trial Call |
|
|
June 17, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
June 17, 2022 | Case Set On Pre-Trial Call - Continued - |
|
|
June 17, 2022 | Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Attorney To Appear - Allowed - |
|
|
May 23, 2022 | Case Set On Pre-Trial Call |
|
|
May 23, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
April 04, 2022 | Case Set On Pre-Trial Call - Continued - |
|
|
April 04, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
April 04, 2022 | Case Set On Trial Call |
|
|
February 02, 2022 | Case Set On Pre-Trial Call |
|
|
February 02, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
January 12, 2022 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
January 12, 2022 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
January 12, 2022 | Motion To - Denied - |
|
|
December 22, 2021 | Miscellaneous Motion - Allowed - |
|
|
December 06, 2021 | Continuance - Allowed - |
|
|
December 06, 2021 | Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed |
|
|
November 08, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI LY TRUST Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
November 08, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI LY TRUST Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
October 26, 2021 |
Answer Filed Attorney Code: 49500 Attorney Name: GOLDSTEIN & MCCLINTOCK LLLP |
|
|
October 19, 2021 |
Answer Filed Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP |
|
|
October 06, 2021 |
Agreed Order Entered Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
October 06, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
October 06, 2021 |
Case Set On Status Call Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
October 04, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
October 04, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Litigant: MOORE WILLIAM Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
October 04, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Litigant: MOORE WILLIAM Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
October 04, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Denied - Litigant: MOORE WILLIAM Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Litigant: MOORE WILLIAM Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Litigant: MOORE WILLIAM Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Denied - Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Denied - Plaintiff: PITTS WENDY Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: PITTS WENDY Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Motion To - Denied - Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
July 27, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: PITTS WENDY Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0130 |
|
|
July 12, 2021 |
Answer/Response/Reply Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
July 12, 2021 |
Notice Of Filing Filed Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
July 07, 2021 |
Exhibits Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
July 07, 2021 |
Answer/Response/Reply Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
July 07, 2021 |
Notice Of Filing Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
July 06, 2021 |
Answer/Response/Reply Attorney Code: 49500 Attorney Name: GOLDSTEIN & MCCLINTOCK LLLP |
|
|
June 14, 2021 |
Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI LY TRUST Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
June 14, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
June 14, 2021 |
Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
June 14, 2021 |
Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
June 14, 2021 |
Agreed Order Entered Litigant: THE PITTS FAMILY TRUST Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
June 14, 2021 |
Agreed Order Entered Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
June 14, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
June 14, 2021 |
Strike From The Call - Allowed - Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
June 11, 2021 |
Notice Of Filing Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
June 11, 2021 |
Answer/Response/Reply Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
June 11, 2021 |
Exhibits Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
June 10, 2021 | Answer/Response/Reply |
|
|
June 10, 2021 |
Proof Of Service Filed Attorney Code: 49500 Attorney Name: GOLDSTEIN & MCCLINTOCK LLLP |
|
|
June 09, 2021 |
Motion To Dismiss Filed Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
June 09, 2021 |
Notice Of Motion Filed Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
June 09, 2021 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
June 09, 2021 |
Notice Of Filing Filed Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
June 09, 2021 |
Answer/Response/Reply Attorney Code: 49500 Attorney Name: GOLDSTEIN & MCCLINTOCK LLLP |
|
|
June 09, 2021 |
Answer/Response/Reply Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
May 14, 2021 |
Notice Of Motion Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
May 14, 2021 |
Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing) Attorney Code: 49500 Attorney Name: GOLDSTEIN & MCCLINTOCK LLLP Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN |
|
|
May 14, 2021 |
Exhibits Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
May 14, 2021 |
Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing) Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
May 14, 2021 |
Exhibits Filed Attorney Code: 49500 Attorney Name: GOLDSTEIN & MCCLINTOCK LLLP Plaintiff: PITTS STEVEN |
|
|
April 21, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI LY TRUST Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
April 21, 2021 |
Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI LY TRUST Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
April 21, 2021 |
Summary Judgment - Continued - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI LY TRUST Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
April 21, 2021 |
Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed - Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
March 23, 2021 |
Case Set On Status Call Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
January 26, 2021 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
January 26, 2021 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
November 23, 2020 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2804 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
November 23, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2804 |
|
|
November 23, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2804 |
|
|
September 17, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
July 06, 2020 |
Execute Or Perform - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
July 06, 2020 |
Strike From The Call - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
July 06, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
July 06, 2020 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
June 02, 2020 |
Postcard Generated Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
June 02, 2020 |
Electronic Notice Sent Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
June 02, 2020 | Electronic Notice Sent |
|
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
April 20, 2020 |
Electronic Notice Sent Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
April 20, 2020 |
Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
April 20, 2020 | Electronic Notice Sent |
|
|
April 20, 2020 |
Postcard Generated Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Electronic Notice Sent |
|
|
March 23, 2020 |
Postcard Generated Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
March 23, 2020 |
Electronic Notice Sent Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
March 23, 2020 |
Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
March 17, 2020 |
Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
January 28, 2020 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
October 29, 2019 |
File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
October 29, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
August 28, 2019 |
Case Set On Status Call Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
August 28, 2019 |
Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG |
|
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - DENIED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
August 28, 2019 |
Motion To - Denied - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG |
|
|
August 12, 2019 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
August 05, 2019 |
Notice Of Filing Of Response Or Answer Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
August 05, 2019 |
Exhibits Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
August 05, 2019 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
August 05, 2019 |
Notice Of Motion Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
August 05, 2019 |
Answer To Affirmative Defense Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
August 05, 2019 |
Default(Set For Motion Hearing) Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF RESPONSE OR ANSWER FILED |
|
July 31, 2019 |
Answer/Response/Reply Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
July 31, 2019 |
Notice Of Filing Filed Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
July 15, 2019 | Answer To Complaint Filed |
|
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED |
|
July 12, 2019 | Answer To Affirmative Defense Filed |
|
|
July 12, 2019 | Response To Answer - Filed |
|
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO ANSWER - FILED |
|
June 21, 2019 |
Summons - Retd N.S. Litigant: UNKNOWN LITIGANT |
|
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD N.S. |
|
June 20, 2019 |
Summons - Retd P.S. Litigant: UNKNOWN LITIGANT |
|
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD P.S. |
|
June 18, 2019 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
June 18, 2019 |
Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
June 04, 2019 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I Filing Fee: $237.00 |
|
|
June 04, 2019 |
Notice Of Motion Filed Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
June 04, 2019 |
Deposit Funds(Set For Motion Hearing) Attorney Code: 47036 Attorney Name: FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ***DEPOSIT FUNDS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
May 29, 2019 |
Summons Issued And Returnable Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
May 29, 2019 |
Notice Of Filing Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
May 29, 2019 |
Exhibits Filed Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS |
|
|
May 29, 2019 |
Appearance And Verified AnswerToComplaintMortgageForeclosure Attorney Code: 43223 Attorney Name: NAUMANN ROBERT K Litigant: THE WILLIAM H. MOORE TRUS Filing Fee: $237.00 |
|
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE AND VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE |
|
May 28, 2019 | Answer To Complaint Filed |
|
|
May 28, 2019 | Notice Of Filing Filed |
|
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED |
|
May 07, 2019 |
File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 |
|
|
May 07, 2019 |
Continuance - Allowed - Plaintiff: THE PITTS FAMI Y TRUST AG Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
May 01, 2019 | Default(Set For Motion Hearing) |
|
|
May 01, 2019 | Exhibits Filed |
|
|
May 01, 2019 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING) |
|
March 29, 2019 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 29, 2019 | Motion Filed |
|
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
March 05, 2019 | Motion Filed |
|
|
March 05, 2019 | Notice Of Motion Filed |
|
|
March 05, 2019 |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - Filing Fee: $237.00 |
|
|
March 05, 2019 |
Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only) Court Time: 0100 |
|
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY) |
|
February 26, 2019 | Waiver Filed |
|
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | WAIVER FILED |
|
January 23, 2019 | Summons - Retd N.S. |
|
|
January 23, 2019 | Summons - Retd P.S. |
|
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD P.S. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD N.S. |
|
January 10, 2019 |
Summons - Retd P.S. Litigant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE I |
|
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETD P.S. |
|
January 09, 2019 | Notice Filed |
|
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED |
|
January 08, 2019 | Certificate Filed |
|
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE FILED |
|
January 03, 2019 | Summons Issued And Returnable |
|
|
January 03, 2019 | New Case Filing |
|
|
January 03, 2019 | Affidavit Filed |
|
|
January 03, 2019 |
Owner Occupied Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed Litigant: GRECO ANNA Filing Fee: $418.00 |
|
|
January 03, 2019 |
Case Set On Case Management Call Court Room: 2808 Court Time: 0930 |
|
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Judge: PERKINS, MARIAN E. |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|