Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DYTRON, INC. vs CHICAGO TITLE & TRUST et al
On May 16, 2016 a detinue case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Robert Lopez Cepero presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 16, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
DETINUE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/LEAVE TO REFILE-ALLOWED
Judge: COLLINS-DOLE, ANN |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION SCHEDULED |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FILED |
|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Judge: COLLINS-DOLE, ANN |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE FILED |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S. |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Judge: COLLINS-DOLE, ANN |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Judge: COLLINS-DOLE, ANN |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS DELIVERED TO SHERIFF |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | DETINUE COMPLAINT FILED |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Judge: CEPERO, ROBERT LOPEZ |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|