Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SMITH THOMAS vs WRIGHT MEDICAL EUROPE, SA et al
On January 04, 2016 a personal injury (product liability) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL. Judge Larry G. Axelrood presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 04, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Cook County, IL
Category
PERSONAL INJURY (PRODUCT LIABILITY)
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Judge: AXELROOD LARRY G |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND) |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY (PRODUCT LIABILITY) COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND) |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE |
|