Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ELYSIA PITRE-LOWER VS LUCAS LOWER
A Dissolution Without Child case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge WILSON, RENEE E. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 09, 2016
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 10/17/2017 |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 09/27/2017 |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - STIPULATED 09/15/2017 Judge:LARSH, ERICK L. | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/15/2017 |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/15/2017 |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 09/12/2017 |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 09/12/2017 |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 08/16/2017 |
|
August 10, 2017 | hearing | CONFERENCE - STATUS | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 08/10/2017 |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 07/03/2017 |
|
December 14, 2016 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTORNEY FEES | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 12/14/2016 |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/14/2016 |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING - RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTORNEY FEES | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 12/14/2016 |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER 12/14/2016 FOR JUDGMENT |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 12/12/2016 |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/12/2016 |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 12/07/2016 | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | POINTS & AUTHORITIES 12/07/2016 |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - ATTORNEY FEE 11/29/2016 |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/06/2016 |
|
October 03, 2016 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTORNEY FEES | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - PARTICIPATE - CHAMBERS CONFERENCE 10/03/2016 |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/03/2016 |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER 10/03/2016 Re: Domestic Violence 16V001917 and 16V001915 |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER 10/03/2016 |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING - RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTORNEY FEES | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 10/03/2016 |
|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 09/29/2016 |
|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 09/29/2016 |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 09/22/2016 Amount:$435.00 |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/22/2016 |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 09/14/2016 |
|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/01/2016 |
|
August 30, 2016 | hearing | HEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 08/30/2016 |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/30/2016 |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES 08/30/2016 Amount:$60.00 |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/30/2016 |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE REQUEST - FAMILY LAW 08/30/2016 Amount:$60.00 | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/26/2016 Amount:$435.00 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 08/26/2016 | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 08/23/2016 |
|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ACCEPT - WILSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 08/23/2016 |
|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 08/23/2016 |
|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 08/23/2016 |
|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE 08/17/2016 |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/09/2016 |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 08/09/2016 |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/09/2016 |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 08/09/2016 |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 08/09/2016 | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 08/09/2016 |