Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
D.L. Evans Bank , vs. Linda Sallee, Webb 1 Built, LLC, Callie Penney, Brian Webb, Joseph Penney, Annabel Ramirez, Patrick Mora .
On August 14, 2023 an aa- all initial district court filings (not e, f, and h1) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Boise County. Judge Fleming, Theodore presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 14, 2023
Last Refreshed
April 12, 2024
Filing Location
Boise County, ID
Filing Court House
District
Judge
Category
AA- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, and H1)
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2025 |
Jury Trial
Judge: Fleming, Theodore |
||
January 29, 2025 |
Jury Trial
Judge: Fleming, Theodore |
||
January 24, 2025 |
Jury Trial
Judge: Fleming, Theodore |
||
January 17, 2025 |
Pre-trial Conference
Judge: Fleming, Theodore |
||
April 12, 2024 |
Motion Hearing - Civil for Court Trial for Claims between Plaintiff and Defendant Linda Sallee Judge: Fleming, Theodore |
||
April 12, 2024 |
Order VACATING APRIL 12, 2024 HEARING ON MOTION FOR COURT TRIAL FOR ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN |
||
April 11, 2024 | MOTION TO VACATE APRIL 12, 2024 HEARING ON MOTION FOR COURT TRIAL FOR ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF D.L. EVANS BANK AND DEFENDANT LINDA C. SALLEE | ||
April 10, 2024 |
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Court Trial |
||
April 05, 2024 | Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Court Trial for All Claims Between Plaintiff D.L. Evans Bank and Defendant Linda C. Sallee | ||
April 03, 2024 |
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests Notice of Service Discovery Requests |
||
March 11, 2024 | Notice of Hearing | ||
March 11, 2024 | Memorandum in Support of Motion for Court Trial | ||
March 11, 2024 | Motion for Court Trial | ||
March 08, 2024 |
Notice Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Linda C. Sallee |
||
February 08, 2024 |
Notice of Taking Deposition First Amended Notice of Deposition of Linda C. Sallee |
||
February 08, 2024 | Stipulation to Conduct Deposition of Linda C. Sallee via Zoom | ||
February 06, 2024 |
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST RULE 26(a)4 REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND OR OTHER PROPERTY FOR INSPECTION UPON DEFENDANT LINDA C. SALLEE |
||
February 06, 2024 |
Notice of Taking Deposition Notice of Deposition of Linda C. Sallee |
||
January 26, 2024 | Scheduling Order | ||
January 12, 2024 |
Scheduling Conference Meeting ID: 986 5710 0603 Passcode: 745841 Judge: Fleming, Theodore |
||
January 04, 2024 | Order | ||
December 29, 2023 |
Stipulation Extend Discovery |
||
December 29, 2023 | Notice of Service of Discovery Requests | ||
December 18, 2023 | Answer to Counterclaim of Defendant Linda C. Sallee | ||
December 05, 2023 | Stipulation of Priority of Brian Webb | ||
December 05, 2023 | Notice of Remote Hearing | ||
December 04, 2023 | Amended Answer & Counterclaim | ||
November 30, 2023 |
Order Granting Leave to Amend Answer & Counterclaim |
||
November 30, 2023 | Stipulation of Priority of Webb 1 Built LLC | ||
November 27, 2023 | Stipulation to Amend Answer & Add Counterclaim | ||
November 20, 2023 | Stipulation to Amend Answer with exhibit - Sallee v. DL Evans | ||
November 17, 2023 |
Motion to Strike Meeting ID: 995 0485 6262 Passcode: 850210 Judge: Fleming, Theodore |
||
November 07, 2023 |
Order Striking Insufficient Defenses and Vacating Hearing |
||
November 06, 2023 |
Response Non-Opposition to Motion to Strike Insufficient Defenses - Sallee |
||
November 03, 2023 | Amended Notice of Hearing | ||
November 02, 2023 |
Order Entry of Default of Patrick Mara |
||
November 02, 2023 |
Order Entry of Default of Callie Penney |
||
November 02, 2023 |
Order Entry of Default of Webb 1 Built, LLC |
||
October 30, 2023 | Affidavit for Entry of Default of Callie Penney | ||
October 30, 2023 | Affidavit for Entry of Default of Webb 1 Built, LLC | ||
October 30, 2023 | Request to Enter Default of Webb 1 Built, LLC | ||
October 30, 2023 | Request to Enter Default of Callie Penney | ||
October 30, 2023 | Request to Enter Default of Patrick Mara | ||
October 30, 2023 | Affidavit for Entry of Default of Patrick Mara | ||
October 23, 2023 | Proof of Publication | ||
October 19, 2023 |
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests Notice of Service for Discovery Requests |
||
October 12, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
October 12, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service Declaration of Service - Callie Penney |
||
October 12, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service Declaration of Service of Webb 1 Built, LLC |
||
October 12, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service Declaration of Service of Patrick Mara |
||
October 06, 2023 |
Motion Rule 12(f)(1) Motion to Strike Insufficient Defenses |
||
October 06, 2023 | Declaration of Service - Joseph Penney | ||
October 06, 2023 |
Memorandum In Support of Motion Memorandum in Support of Rule 12(f)(1) Motion to Strike Insufficient Defenses |
||
September 18, 2023 |
Default of Brian Webb |
||
September 18, 2023 |
Default of Annabel Ramirez |
||
September 15, 2023 | Answer Foreclosure Complaint - Sallee DL Evans | ||
September 15, 2023 | Answer Affirmative Defenses - Penny DL Evans | ||
September 14, 2023 |
Notice of Intent to Take Default Three Day Notice of Intent to Take Default |
||
September 14, 2023 | Request to Enter Default - Brian Webb | ||
September 14, 2023 | Affidavit for Entry of Default of Brian Webb | ||
September 13, 2023 | Affidavit for Entry of Default of Annabel Ramirez | ||
September 13, 2023 | Request to Enter Default of Annabel Ramirez | ||
September 12, 2023 |
Civil Case Information Sheet Civil_Cover_Sheet_01.17 - Penney |
||
September 12, 2023 | Notice of Appearance - Penney | ||
August 31, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service Declaration of Service of Annabel Ramirez |
||
August 29, 2023 |
Civil Case Information Sheet Civil_Cover_Sheet_01.17 (CV08-23-00200)- Sallee |
||
August 29, 2023 | Notice of Appearance - Sallee | ||
August 25, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service Affidavit of Service (Brian Webb) |
||
August 24, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service Proof of Service (Linda Sallee) |
||
August 21, 2023 | Lis Pendens | ||
August 21, 2023 |
Summons Issued Summons for Publication |
||
August 21, 2023 | Order for Service (Publication) | ||
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Summons - Webb 1 Built, LLC |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Summons - Linda |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | New Case - District Civil | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet Case Info Sheet |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed Verified Complaint for Decree of Foreclosure |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Summons - Brian |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Summons - Callie |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Publication of Summons | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Summons - Patrick |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Summons - Joseph |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Summons - Annabel |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of Motion for Publication of Summons | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Summons for Publication |